Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Waterways Tax Credit Act
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax for the purchase price of equipment used to install or maintain a floating garden; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to provide a specified report on or before December 1, 2016 and each December thereafter; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0085 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
12/17/2015 Text - First - Clean Waterways Tax Credit Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM