Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain applicants for certain licenses from the requirement to submit a set of fingerprints with the application if the applicant has submitted certain fingerprints for a prior license application in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/14/2019
Legislative Date
7/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/14/2019 7/14/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-106, 5-107, 5-108, 5-117.1, 5-303, 5-305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page