Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Military Training and Military Spouses
Sponsored by
Senator Currie
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an occupational licensing board to issue a license, certificate, permit, or registration to an applicant who is military trained or who is a military spouse if the applicant meets specified requirements; requiring an occupational licensing board to consider specified types of experience for a specified calculation; authorizing an occupational licensing board to issue a temporary license, certificate, permit, or registration under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/06/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 9/06/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
(   10-1301, 10-1302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page