Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a correctional officer from operating a motor vehicle in which an inmate is an occupant unless the inmate is restrained by a seat belt; prohibiting a law enforcement officer from operating a motor vehicle in which a person in custody is an occupant unless the person in custody is restrained by a seat belt; requiring a specified lap belt and shoulder harness be used under specified circumstances; and establishing specified civil penalties under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/23/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/23/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page