Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish a Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to be used only for nonpoint source pollution control projects except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the transfer of funds in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to the General Fund or a special fund of the State except under specified circumstances; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1346
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0028 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM