Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing for archery hunters in Anne Arundel County a safety zone of 100 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp within which archery hunting may not take place except under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0321
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/26/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554335/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920511/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/26/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {554335/1 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Astle) Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 30
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 33
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 35
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {920511/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM