Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to require that a boating safety education course include information relating to carbon monoxide poisoning; requiring the Department to develop an informational brochure on the dangers of carbon monoxide poisoning while boating and while in an enclosed occupancy compartment; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018, on the prevention of carbon monoxide poisoning relating to motorboat operation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0795
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/06/2017
Legislative Date
11/06/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {363626/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {873827/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/06/2017 11/06/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {984535/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {363626/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {873827/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-701, 8-712.2, 8-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM