Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State's Attorney in a certain criminal case to make a timely disclosure to a defendant if certain facial recognition technology or certain forensic genetic genealogical DNA analysis technology has been used during the criminal investigation; and defining certain terms.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/05/2019
Legislative Date
9/05/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/05/2019 9/05/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page