Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Manno, Kittleman, Astle, Mathias, Reilly, Simonaire, Stone, and Jacobs
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0466 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/21/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/21/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.1, 10-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM