Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsored by
Senator Corderman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each nursing home and assisted living program to establish certain policies and procedures authorizing indoor visitation from an essential caregiver and relating to the designation and use of an essential caregiver; authorizing nursing homes and assisted living programs to consult with a certain local health officer when establishing certain policies and procedures; requiring an essential caregiver to inform the staff of the nursing home or assisted living program if the essential caregiver develops certain symptoms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2020
Legislative Date
10/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/17/2020 10/17/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 1:25 PM
Click to return on the top page