Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth, Feldman, Klausmeier, Patterson, Salling, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $7,500 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred by an individual that are attributable to the individual's donation of an organ; altering the definition of "qualified expenses" for purposes of the subtraction modification to include unreimbursed expenses for child care, elder care, and medication; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0010
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0651 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/31/2020
Legislative Date
8/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/31/2020 8/31/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:41 PM