Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' and Renters' Property Tax Credits - Deadlines
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from September 1 to October 1 the deadlines by which certain applicants may apply for the homeowners' and renters' property tax credits; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to make available certain homeowners' tax credit application forms by the February 15 preceding the taxable year in which the homeowners' property tax credit is sought; changing from May 1 to April 15 the deadline by which applicants must submit their homeowners' tax credit applications to be reflected on a county's tax bill; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Homeowners' and Renters' Property Tax Credits - Deadlines
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Favorable Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Second Reading Passed 8
Text - Third - Property Tax - Homeowners' and Renters' Property Tax Credits - Deadlines
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM