Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Queen Anne's County - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Queen Anne's County Board of License Commissioners to issue a specified number of Beer and Wine Festival (BWF) licenses in the county each year; authorizing the Board to select a specified number of weekends each year for a specified festival; and requiring the Board to choose a specified location for a specified festival and to ensure that the primary focus of a specified festival is the promotion of Maryland beer and wine.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0212
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0716 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 37
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM