Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Kent County to issue a beer or wine tasting (BWT) license to the holder of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; providing that the license authorizes, for tasting purposes only, the on-premises consumption of specified beer or wine; limiting the amount of beer or wine that the holder of the license may allow to be consumed by a single individual in a single day; prohibiting a license holder from conducting a beer tasting and a wine tasting in a single day; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0226
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324836/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {324836/1 Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-410, 16-507, 8-408.2 )
(   10-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM