Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for Rent
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the liability of a person on active duty with the United States military, for rent under a lease, is limited; limiting the liability for rent of the spouse of a person on active duty with the United States military under specified circumstances; clarifying that the liability of a person on active duty or the spouse of a person on active duty for rent under a lease may not exceed any rent or lawful charges then due and payable plus 30 days under specified conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1365 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2016
Legislative Date
11/15/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2016 11/15/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for Rent
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {268777/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for Rent
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for Rent
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-212.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM