Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $2,400 to $5,000 the salary of the president and from $2,400 to $4,500 the salary of the other regular members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Elections; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Elections.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0158
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2017
Legislative Date
11/13/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694937/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2017 11/13/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {694937/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 55
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM