Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to be the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; providing that the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program is the successor of the food supplement program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
6
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Appropriations 6
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM