Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Belvoir-Scott's Plantation Historic Manor House
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $90,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Belvoir-Scott's Plantation, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Belvoir-Scott's Plantation Historic Manor House, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1592
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0155 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/28/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM