Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the owner of a burial lot is responsible for the care of specified monuments or memorials; providing that this Act does not prohibit a responsible party for a cemetery from maintaining or repairing a memorial or monument under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/05/2016
Legislative Date
8/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2017
Legislative Date
1/10/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807876/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/05/2016 8/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Senate 1/10/2017 1/10/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {807876/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 16
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Text - Chapter - Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM