Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer to make a reasonable attempt to intervene to terminate or prevent another police officer's use of excessive force; prohibiting a police officer from knowingly and willfully violating the requirement to intervene established under the Act; establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $10,000 or both for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page