Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Contracts - Noncompetition Covenant - Conditions Affecting Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the enforcement of a noncompetition covenant between an individual and the individual's prior employer under specified circumstances; and applying the Act only prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/31/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/31/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM