Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, under specified circumstances, the right to compensation for permanent total disability due in part to accidental personal injury or resulting from an occupational disease and payable under specified provisions of law survives to specified individuals under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0559
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-640, 9-641 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM