Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, rather than authorizing, the Governor to include in the annual State budget an amount equal to the lesser of $15,000,000 or the amount sufficient to reimburse Prince George's County for the use of local impact grant funds from video lottery terminals to pay for Maryland Route 210 infrastructure projects.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1596
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2019
Legislative Date
10/10/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2019 10/10/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:54 AM