Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Ramirez, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund may not discriminate among insureds by charging different premiums to insureds who select, as a payment option, the Fund's installment payment plan instead of a premium finance agreement; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0478
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807176/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {807176/1 Report Adopted 4
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 4
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 7
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM