Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a designee of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to administer the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to publish on its website the names of certain donors to the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund who have authorized the Department to publish their names; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0242
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/14/2017
Legislative Date
11/14/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/14/2017 11/14/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {904539/1 Adopted 3
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 3
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 5
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 7
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM