Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a clean energy attribute credit standard for certain purposes; repealing certain provisions relating to the renewable energy portfolio standard; stating certain findings of the General Assembly; stating certain policies of the State regarding certain energy sources and markets; requiring the Public Service Commission to appoint an independent administrator for certain purposes with certain qualifications and certain duties; providing for the term and reappointment of the independent administrator; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0220
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0890 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 5:56 PM