Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Ferguson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the types of motor vehicle liability insurers that may exclude coverage to operators providing transportation network services; prohibiting a person from operating a transportation network company in the State without a permit issued by the Public Service Commission; providing that before December 15, 2016, the Commission may not require an applicant for a for-hire driver's license or transportation network operator's license to comply with a specified criminal history records check; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0003
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/03/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {257678/1
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/4 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333195/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/03/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {257678/1 12
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 12
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 12
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Special Order until 2/4 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 17
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18A
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 20
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {333195/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-517, 19-517.1 )
(   10-101, 10-104.1, 10-110, 10-112, 10-210, 10-403.1, 10-404, 10-406, 10-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM