Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain surface mining permittee, on discovery of a sudden subsidence of the surface of the land, to immediately implement appropriate safety measures to protect public health and safety; requiring a certain permittee to permanently replace a water supply within a zone of dewatering influence within 45 days of the date on which the permittee knew of the water supply failure; authorizing a certain surface mining permittee to seek reimbursement for certain water supply replacement costs under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/09/2018
Legislative Date
10/09/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Contested Case Hearing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254938/1
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254938/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254938/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {610017/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/09/2018 10/09/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Contested Case Hearing
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {254938/1 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 19A
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {254938/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) 20
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 20
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {254938/1 Adopted 21
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 23
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {610017/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text - Chapter - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-801, 15-812, 15-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM