Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Planning - Central Depository
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Planning)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain provision of law relating to the submission of certain plans to the Department of Planning; clarifying that the Department is the depository for all land use plans, amendments, and revisions adopted by certain entities in the State; requiring a certain unit of government or a certain agency to submit to the Department a current version of all adopted land use plans, amendments, and revisions; and requiring the Department to post on its website a copy of certain land use plans, amendments, and revisions.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0131 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2018
Legislative Date
10/31/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Planning - Central Depository
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Planning - Central Depository
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Planning - Central Depository
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2018 10/31/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Planning - Central Depository
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {634335/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Planning - Central Depository
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text - Chapter - Department of Planning - Central Depository
(   5-501, 5-502, 5-503 through 5-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page