Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund and establishing a related income tax return checkoff; requiring the Department of State Police to administer the Fund and to adopt certain regulations to implement the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring the Governor for fiscal year 2022 to appropriate $50,000 for the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2019
Legislative Date
9/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2019 9/25/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1501 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM