Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,068,545,000, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM