Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Sun Valley Park Playground
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $50,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the County Executive and the County Council of Anne Arundel County for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the playground at Sun Valley Park, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0038
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2018 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 151). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 151 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2016
Legislative Date
9/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2016 9/27/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Sun Valley Park Playground
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM