Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing or altering the distribution of specified revenue; altering or repealing specified required appropriations; authorizing the use of specified funds for specified purposes; providing for the transfer of specified funds; repealing a specified requirement for a specified notice relating to abandoned property to be published in specified newspapers; requiring the Comptroller to maintain a specified abandoned property database; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-311 )
(   16-305, 17-104, 23-108, 23-205, 23-503, 5-202 )
(   13-1116, 2-302, 7-307 )
(   31-107.2 )
(   5-212, 8-709 )
(   2-801, 4-506 )
(   10-704, 10-730, 10-733, 2-1302.1 )
(   13-209 )
(   8-613.3 )
(   2011, 2013, 2014 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM