Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the driver of a school vehicle from allowing an individual who is not a student or school employee to board or ride on the school vehicle, subject to specified exceptions; and authorizing specified individuals to board or ride on a school vehicle under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0440
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0359 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {338376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {338376/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-816 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM