Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Election Observers
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a copy of a list of registered voters be provided to an election observer on receipt of specified documentation; requiring an election judge to protect an election observer in the exercise of specified rights; requiring an election judge to designate reasonable times for election observers to examine polling lists; requiring an election judge to allow an election observer to have access to the voting room at a polling place; providing that, except under specified circumstances, an election observer has specified rights; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2016
Legislative Date
9/29/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Election Observers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2016 9/29/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Election Observers
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-303, 10-304, 10-308, 10-309, 10-311.1, 1-101, 11-301, 3-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM