Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing to 25% the minimum percentage of a unit's total dollar value of contracts that are, to the extent practicable, to be made directly to small businesses; providing that certain preferences do not apply to certain procurement contracts; requiring a certain unit to apply a 5% percentage price preference on certain procurement contracts designated for the small business reserve under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0772 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 12:49 PM
Click to return on the top page