Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a child conceived by artificial insemination of a married woman with the consent of her spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses for all purposes; providing that the consent of the woman's spouse is presumed; establishing certain rules and procedures specific to an independent adoption by an individual who is the spouse of the prospective adoptee's parent at the time of the prospective adoptee's birth; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-3B-16, 5-3B-17, 5-3B-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM