Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Reilly, Beidle, and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to adopt a certain ordinance to prohibit littering and to impose certain criminal and civil penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0077
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2019
Legislative Date
9/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2019 9/22/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/17/2020 11:10 AM