Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Reilly, Beidle, and Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to adopt a certain ordinance to prohibit littering and to impose certain criminal and civil penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0077
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2019
Legislative Date
9/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2019 9/22/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
(   10-110 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page