Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member Terms
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the two-term limit for members of the Board of Trustees of the Chesapeake Bay Trust applies only to consecutive terms; and repealing a limitation on the ability of the Chesapeake Bay Trust to solicit or accept a gift, bequest, or lease of real or personal property.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0121
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/12/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 12
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 14
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 16
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1904, 8-1906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM