Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified documents from prohibiting a specified homeowner or tenant from installing or cultivating a backyard garden; establishing that a specified homeowner or tenant may not be prohibited from installing or cultivating a backyard garden on specified property; providing that a local jurisdiction may not prohibit specified backyard gardens; applying the prohibition to charter counties and Baltimore City; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0434
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/11/2016
Legislative Date
10/11/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/11/2016 10/11/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on Restrictions
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-401, 4-104 )
(   14-133 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM