Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that certain employees working at a heightened security interest location be paid a certain wage or combination of wages and benefits; declaring findings of the General Assembly; specifying that certain provisions of the Act do not diminish certain rights of certain covered employees; specifying that a certain agreement to work for less than a certain wage is void under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to keep certain records for at least 3 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0794 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM