Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to appoint a Chief Resilience Officer to be responsible for coordinating State and local efforts to build resilience to risks identified in the Maryland Hazard Mitigation Plan; providing that the Chief Resilience Officer serves at the pleasure of the Director; establishing the duties of the Chief Resilience Officer, including identifying funding streams and technical assistance and working with leaders of vulnerable industries; requiring a certain annual report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0542
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0721 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page