Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Higher Education Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Maryland Higher Education Commission is authorized to impose renewal fees on specified postsecondary educational institutions; requiring that revenues from application and renewal fees be distributed to a specified fund; altering the conditions under which the Commission may authorize specified religious educational institutions to operate without a certificate of approval; requiring specified religious educational institutions to obtain a certificate of approval; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/16/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684838/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/16/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {684838/1 Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Appropriations 13
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-105, 11-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM