Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to make available the investigational drug, biological product, or device to eligible patients; specifying the manner in which a specified drug, product, or device may be provided to eligible patients; prohibiting a health occupations board from taking specified action against a health care provider's license on a specified basis; establishing that the Act does not create a specified cause of action; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0056
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2B-01 through 21-2B-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM