Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund - Liability for Insolvent Self-Insured Employers - Limitation
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Uninsured Employers' Fund)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the liability of the Uninsured Employers' Fund to pay the outstanding obligations of insolvent self-insured employers to claims that have been found compensable by the Workers' Compensation Commission as of the date of insolvency; and prohibiting the Fund from being required to pay more than $100,000 per claim under a certain provision of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2018
Legislative Date
10/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2018 10/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Uninsured Employers' Fund - Liability for Insolvent Self-Insured Employers - Limitation
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM