Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reauthorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain newly constructed dwellings in Baltimore City, subject to certain limitations; expanding the tax credit program to authorize the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, the property tax credit to certain owners of certain substantially rehabilitated dwellings; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted on or after July 1, 2025; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM