Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who caused the unavailability of the declarant of the statement under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0040
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568277/1
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568277/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (127-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {882115/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (127-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page