Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for purposes of regulating common ownership community property management services in the State; providing for the composition of the Board; providing that the Act does not prohibit certain persons from providing services under certain circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0530 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/24/2017
Legislative Date
8/24/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2018
Legislative Date
1/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/24/2017 8/24/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2018 1/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.15, 2-106.16, 2-108 )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM