Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Beidle, Eckardt, Griffith, Guzzone, Hester, Kelley, Patterson, Rosapepe, West, Carozza, Gallion, Kagan, Lam, Pinsky, Reilly, Simonaire, Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Statewide Broadband in the Department of Housing and Community Development to ensure that every resident of the State is supported by high-quality, affordable broadband Internet service and has the tools necessary to take advantage of the Internet; requiring the Office to develop, by July 1, 2022, a statewide plan to ensure that all State residents have the ability to connect to reliable broadband Internet by December 31, 2026; establishing the Digital Inclusion Fund to support capacity building in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0097
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183293/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-17)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {574437/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {183293/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (120-17) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text - Chapter - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
(   6.5-101 through 6.5-107, 6.6-107 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page